THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH EAST BRABOURNE

Charity number: 1095462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.49k £4.96k £3.99k £4.99k £28.98k
Total expenditure £0 £6.86k £0 £11.35k £667
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A