Accounts and annual returns CAPE FAREWELL (OCEAN)

Charity number: 1094747
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 March 2022 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window