Financial history CAPE FAREWELL (OCEAN)

Charity number: 1094747
Charity reporting is up to date (43 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £106.10k £32.66k £133.00k £367.92k £103.21k
Total expenditure £169.29k £29.48k £74.13k £321.72k £124.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k N/A £24.25k N/A N/A