HOMELESS ACTION RESOURCE PROJECT

Charity number: 1098126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alistair Charles Barr Trustee 17 March 2020 None on record
David Mark Rothman Trustee 05 May 2016 None on record
LILIAS DAVIDSON FELTON Trustee None on record
RICHARD ROBERT HAIR Chair None on record
ALEXSANDRA KAYE Trustee 04 August 2014 None on record
DR HAROON AQEEL SIDDIQUE Trustee 07 August 2017 None on record
YVONNE HAZEL VICKERS Trustee 04 April 2016 None on record
Joanne Elizabeth Prestidge Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
Iain Campbell Trustee 04 April 2016 None on record
Debbie Stanton Trustee 04 April 2016 None on record
PETER NIGEL THORN Trustee None on record
Michael Eric Nevin Trustee 14 December 2020 None on record