LONDON WHEELCHAIR RUGBY CLUB

Charity number: 1096669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £113.09k £125.24k £95.48k £120.73k £79.05k
Total expenditure £98.20k £152.42k £113.15k £117.69k £88.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A