Trustees ST. CATHERINE'S VILLAGE HALL LIMITED

Charity number: 1095139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Jane Fielding Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
Lizanne Greenberg Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
Prof Nigel Fielding Trustee 10 February 2022
None on record
Stephanie Webster Trustee 08 April 2020
None on record
ROBERT DRAKE Trustee 16 February 2018
None on record
Richard Garcka Trustee 09 April 2016
None on record
Eric Hewitt Thorniley Trustee 01 June 2012
None on record
ROSAMUND CHARLOTTE CALOW Trustee 07 December 2009
None on record