Financial history MOUNTAIN OF RESTORATION

Charity number: 1100369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £100 £1.00k £3.50k £1.20k £12.00k
Total expenditure £360 £950 £3.50k £1.10k £11.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A