STREET LEAGUE

Charity number: 1101313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.67m £6.03m £5.72m £5.80m £6.40m
Total expenditure £5.65m £5.97m £5.97m £5.30m £5.03m
Income from government contracts £1.87m £2.14m £2.64m N/A N/A
Income from government grants £372.53k £40.38k £85.72k £2.28m £2.39m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.19m £1.45m £1.53m £1.32m £2.09m
Income - Other trading activities £192.00k £263.53k £223.52k £45.50k £319
Income - Charitable activities £4.27m £4.29m £3.94m £4.44m £4.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £880 £569 £309 £106 £192
Income - Other £17.47k £21.88k £24.65k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.39m £5.58m £5.54m £4.93m £4.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £258.55k £389.08k £427.23k £370.12k £322.39k
Expenditure - Governance £50.52k £10.13k £8.01k £0 £12.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0