STREET LEAGUE

Charity number: 1101313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Coleman Trustee 23 June 2020 None on record
Lesley Giddins Trustee 14 December 2017 None on record
William Jonathan Rennie Trustee 12 December 2019 None on record
ANDY RANSOM Trustee 23 September 2014 None on record
Dee Leanne Townsend Trustee 13 March 2018 None on record
STUART BEAVER Trustee 16 December 2015 None on record