Financial history THE LIVERPOOL FILM ACADEMY EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1095371
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £137.42k £155.82k £49.56k £167.89k £25.98k
Total expenditure £91.06k £119.88k £136.54k £133.42k £173.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.21k N/A N/A N/A N/A