BELLARY SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1095365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £24.58k £28.00k £13.52k £4.34k £11.12k
Total expenditure £11.68k £11.00k £8.26k £8.11k £7.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A