Accounts and annual returns ASHBOURNE CENTRE FOR GESTALT TRAINING PSYCHOTHERAPY AND COUNSELLING SERVICES

Charity Number: 1101892
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 07 August 2013 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2012 22 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 12 September 2012 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2011 10 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 14 July 2011 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2010 17 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 20 January 2011 On Time