Trustees EUROPEAN ORTHODONTIC SOCIETY
Charity number: 1095190

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Michael Martin Peter Wolf | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jasmina Primozic | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aman Ulhaq | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ANDREU PUIGDOLLERS | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alberto Marcello CAPRIOGLIO | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lorraine Suzette Barreto | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mauro Cozzani | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Yijin Ren | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Theodore Eliades | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr MELISSA ANJETA DISSE | Trustee | 03 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Adriano Crismani | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Finn Geoghegan | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PIOTR FUDALEJ | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr DEMETRIOS HALAZONETIS | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR VASKA VANDEVSKA-RADUNOVIC | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christodoulos Laspos | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor DIRK BISTER | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR FRASER MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.