Financial history GREAT OAKS SMALL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1105559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £521.10k £813.36k £968.14k £1.08m £1.26m
Total expenditure £458.38k £705.03k £878.92k £963.99k £1.10m
Income from government contracts £0 £778.84k £952.85k £1.08m £1.26m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.11k £20.88k £7.51k £204 £50
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £518.60k £792.47k £960.63k £1.08m £1.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £393 £16 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £458.38k £705.03k £878.92k £963.99k £1.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.70k £1.26k £2.34k £3.60k £3.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0