Trustees GREAT OAKS SMALL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1105559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie-Anne Kelly Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Ian Matheson Grant Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Daniel Rantay Friend Trustee 17 June 2019
GAZEN SALTS NATURE RESERVE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF SANDWICH INFANT SCHOOL TRUST
Received: 114 days late
STUART PHILIP JONES Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
SANDRA JONES Trustee 26 March 2019
None on record
Clive Best Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record