SOMALI WELL WOMEN PROJECT

Charity number: 1097595
Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 92 days
Annual return 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 458 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 458 days
Annual return 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 823 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 823 days
Annual return 05 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1188 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1188 days
Annual return 05 April 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1553 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1553 days