AFRICAN FAMILIES FOCUS AND RELIEF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1097868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 June 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 17 June 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 04 June 2018 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 22 June 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required