BRIGHOUSE THEATRE GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
Governance
- 25 February 2003: Standard registration
- 02 November 2007: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 02 November 2007: Funds transferred to 1012902 BRIGHOUSE THEATRE PRODUCTIONS
- B. T. G (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.01k | £6.05k | £6.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.76k | £6.67k | £6.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 15 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 23 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 26 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
1. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF DRAMA & MUSIC; IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING PUBLIC DRAMATIC PERFORMANCES, MUSICAL CONCERTS AND RECITALS. 2. TO PROVIDE A CIVIC HALL, ROOMS AND ANCILLARY FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERFORMANCES, MUSICAL CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRIGHOUSE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BRIGHOUSE, CALDERDALE MBC, WEST YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window