THE CHRISTADELPHIAN SUNDAY SCHOOL UNION

Charity number: 1097921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 13 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 09 January 2017 On time Download