THE CHRISTADELPHIAN SUNDAY SCHOOL UNION

Charity number: 1097921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £27.53k £25.71k £19.55k £18.70k £14.32k
Total expenditure £23.23k £24.30k £18.94k £17.26k £18.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A