LYTCHETT MATRAVERS PRE-SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Pre-school that offers sessional and full day care for children aged from 2 until Primary school age. We also offer a breakfast club and an after school club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £196,915 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 17 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Glew | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Pettit | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Pettit | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gemma White | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.32k | £312.78k | £300.87k | £335.91k | £336.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £350.17k | £302.74k | £252.64k | £290.46k | £324.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £208.79k | N/A | £167.92k | £167.68k | £196.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 10TH DECEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE HIGH QUALITY PRE-SCHOOL EDUCATION AND CARE FOR ANY YOUNG CHILD IN THE LOCAL AREA, REGARDLESS OF ETHNIC BACK GROUND, CULTURE, RELIGION, HOME LANGUAGE, FAMILY BACKGROUND, SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, DISABILITY, GENDER OR ABILITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE LYTCHETT MATRAVERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LYTCHETT PRE SCHOOL
91 WAREHAM ROAD
LYTCHETT MATRAVERS
POOLE
BH16 6DY
- Phone:
- 01202 623915
- Email:
- lytmatpreschool@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window