Accounts and annual returns SOCIAL CARE IN ACTION

Charity number: 1096903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 09 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 09 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 08 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window