Financial history SOCIAL CARE IN ACTION

Charity number: 1096903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £8.79m £8.83m £8.23m £11.80m £8.23m
Total expenditure £7.60m £8.98m £9.08m £12.34m £4.76m
Income from government contracts £5.72m £6.24m £5.25m £9.73m £2.89m
Income from government grants £0 N/A £234.78k £96.41k £649.99k
Income - Donations and legacies £942.32k £336 £2.84k £186.30k £1.20k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £7.72m £0 £4.02m £404.23k
Income - Charitable activities £7.66m £983.00k £6.89m £7.36m £3.95m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £106.03k £113.48k £142.76k £232.73k £110.16k
Income - Other £84.72k £16.15k £0 £0 £3.77m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.60m £7.96m £9.07m £9.02m £4.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £35.85k £7.76k £67.48k £4.27k
Expenditure - Governance £32.51k £22.51k £31.14k £51.69k £41.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £983.92k £0 £3.25m £269.50k