"ASHRAM" - LAMBETH ASIAN ELDERLY DAYCENTRE

Charity number: 1097364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 May 2021 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 May 2021 462 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2018 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required