Accounts and annual returns THE ST. PAUL'S KNIGHTSBRIDGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1097712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 November 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 November 2019 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window