Financial history THE ST. PAUL'S KNIGHTSBRIDGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1097712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £169.08k £156.78k £207.39k £36.85k £119.12k
Total expenditure £108.83k £102.74k £100.93k £85.97k £144.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A