Trustees THE TEMPLE MUSIC FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1095141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GUY BERINGER QC Chair 18 January 2016
None on record
Ian Charles Moyler Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Jennifer Jonas Trustee 16 March 2018
None on record
The Hon Sir MARTIN SPENCER QC Trustee 23 October 2017
None on record
The Rt Hon Sir Christopher Simon Courtenay Stephen Clarke Trustee 23 October 2017
None on record
Michael McLaren QC Trustee 25 March 2014
None on record
DANIEL TOLEDANO QC Trustee 02 May 2013
THE BARRISTERS' BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE HON PHILIP NIGEL HAVERS QC Trustee 02 May 2013
None on record
KATIE BRADFORD Trustee 20 December 2011
MAHOGANY OPERA GROUP
Received: On time
KATIE BRADFORD ARTS TRUST
Received: On time
ROBERT VENABLES QC Trustee
THE YVES GUIHANNEC FOUNDATION
Received: 1 day late
ROSAMUND HORWOOD-SMART QC Trustee
THE ROGER AND INGRID PILKINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST