Financial history ASYLUM LINK MERSEYSIDE

Charity number: 1095180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £321.13k £378.75k £398.66k £447.34k £405.26k
Total expenditure £344.25k £421.02k £377.01k £345.50k £379.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £15.00k £15.00k £15.00k