ASYLUM LINK MERSEYSIDE

Charity number: 1095180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tim Beaumont Trustee 04 February 2019 None on record
Zabihullah Enayet Trustee 29 March 2021 None on record
ERNEST KATSANDE Trustee None on record
Bridget Mary Sharkey Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record
EMAD LILO Trustee 26 March 2013 None on record
GARRICK PRAYOGG Trustee None on record
DENIA ANN KINCADE Trustee 01 September 2011 None on record
Syed Maqsood Trustee 04 February 2019 None on record
WILLIAM JOHN CHAMBERS Chair 25 March 2013
MILAP FESTIVAL TRUST Received: On time
Dr Paula Grey Trustee 31 July 2015
HEALTH24 Recently registered
THE CASS FOUNDATION LIMITED Received: On time
Damian McDonald Trustee 28 September 2020 None on record