ST MELLION PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1096379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £14.74k £5.15k £5.08k £4.00k £1.96k
Total expenditure £20.58k £7.80k £1.54k £1.72k £3.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A