THE MANDALA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our focus is on supporting locally initiated and run projects to enable children and young people in the developing world to lead better, more fulfilled lives. We offer start up and next stage funding rather than ongoing revenue support. We do not respond to uninvited applications. We have a simple application process and a straightforward accountability mechanism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Afghanistan
- Ethiopia
- India
- Indonesia
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Mexico
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- South Africa
- Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 04 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Henry Christopher Dieudonne-Demaria | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ruth Sutherland | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Tulip | Trustee | 25 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Dione Brigid Avison | Trustee | 05 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.68k | £38.98k | £32.12k | £21.27k | £24.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.89k | £29.40k | £37.00k | £21.52k | £26.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 07 MAR 2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BY NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25, IN VULNERABLE SITUATIONS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD TO ACCESS THE EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL, SOCIAL HEALTH AND ANY OTHER SERVICES THEY NEED TO DEVELOP THEIR POTENTIAL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wayfarers
Market Street
Charlbury
OX7 3PH
- Phone:
- 01608 811940
- Email:
- info@mandalatrust.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window