COMMONWEALTH PARLIAMENTARY ASSOCIATION (UNITED KINGDOM BRANCH)

Charity number: 1095118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rt Hon Baroness D'Souza Trustee 12 July 2017
THE ZIMBIALA TRUST Received: On time
PARLIAMENTARY HUMAN RIGHTS TRUST
RT Hon RICHARD PEREGRINE LIDDELL- GRAINGER MP Trustee 13 August 2011 None on record
Baroness Gillian Joanna Merron Trustee 14 September 2021 None on record
Ian Murray MP Trustee 12 July 2017 None on record
Chris Elmore MP Trustee 28 January 2020 None on record
Lord Alan Gordon Barraclough Haselhurst Trustee 04 July 2018 None on record
David Mundell MP Trustee 28 January 2020 None on record
MP Bob Blackman Trustee 04 July 2018 None on record
Steve Brine MP Trustee 28 January 2020 None on record
LORD NAVNIT DHOLAKIA Trustee 13 August 2011 None on record
ANDREW RICHARD ROSINDELL MP Trustee 13 August 2011 None on record
Lord Byron Davies of Gower Trustee 28 January 2020 None on record
RT HON LORD FOULKES OF CUMNOCK Trustee 08 May 2012 None on record
Theodora Roosevelt Clarke Trustee 09 November 2021 None on record
Sarah Champion Trustee 03 July 2019 None on record
Harriett Baldwin MP Trustee 28 January 2020 None on record
Layla Moran MP Trustee 28 January 2020 None on record
Julie Elliott MP Trustee 28 January 2020 None on record
DR Lisa Cameron MP Trustee 28 January 2020
UNITED KINGDOM - JAPAN 21ST CENTURY GROUP Received: On time
Rt Hon Maria Frances Lewis Miller MP Trustee 12 July 2017
BELARUS FREE THEATRE Overdue by 2 days