COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1095050
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 November 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)