COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1095050
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joyce Mary D'Silva Trustee 10 November 2017 None on record
SARAH PETRINI Trustee 31 March 2005
FARM LIVESTOCK TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING (ATHENE) TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
VALERIE JAMES Chair 27 July 2006
FARM LIVESTOCK TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING (ATHENE) TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
Josphat Ngonyo Kisui Trustee 11 September 2020 None on record
MR JEREMY HAYWARD Trustee 14 November 2002
FARM LIVESTOCK TRUST LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING (ATHENE) TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
MR MAHI KLOSTERHALFEN Trustee 27 September 2014 None on record
SIR DAVID CHRISTOPHER ANDREW MADDEN Trustee 23 July 2010 None on record
MR TEDDY BOURNE Trustee 14 November 2002 None on record