Financial history ST ANDREW HOLBORN AND STAFFORD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1095045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £350.87k £581.18k £671.98k £460.42k £429.59k
Total expenditure £341.38k £557.39k £582.82k £641.27k £552.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £1.94k £6.06k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £579.24k £665.92k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £463.45k £495.34k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £93.94k £87.48k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £57.30k £63.87k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £204.06k £208.73k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £61.80k £60.63k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A