Accounts and annual returns AGE UK WAKEFIELD DISTRICT

Charity number: 1096511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window