Financial history AGE UK WAKEFIELD DISTRICT

Charity number: 1096511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.62m £1.71m £1.64m £1.73m £2.25m
Total expenditure £1.72m £1.66m £1.69m £1.82m £2.07m
Income from government contracts £517.41k £461.75k £425.50k £403.76k £434.40k
Income from government grants £5.00k £591.18k £505.89k £551.00k £722.63k
Income - Donations and legacies £95.68k £48.86k £67.86k £13.28k £116.35k
Income - Other trading activities £194.30k £167.10k £97.62k £91.52k £30.95k
Income - Charitable activities £1.33m £1.49m £1.48m £1.62m £2.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £50.04k £26.82k £1.07k £800 £19.16k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.55m £1.52m £1.62m £1.74m £1.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £173.39k £146.08k £0 £76.10k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £11.29k £6.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £74.75k £0 £86.34k