GREENSIDE SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FUND RAISING FOR GREENSIDE SCHOOL SUPPLYING ADDITIONAL RESOURCES FOR PUPILS OF GREENSIDE SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 February 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Tomkins | Chair | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||
EMMA DELLOW | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||
David Smith | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN SMITH | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID VICTOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.60k | £1.81k | £4.56k | £15.68k | £11.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.43k | £5.03k | £1.39k | £57.16k | £53.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF GREENSIDE SCHOOL, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES, EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES, AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR PUPILS WHICH ARE IN ADDITION TO THOSE PROVIDED BY LOCAL OR CENTRAL GOVERNMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenside School
Shephall Green
Stevenage
SG2 9XS
- Phone:
- 01438315356
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window