Accounts and annual returns WIRRAL DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1096933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window