Accounts and annual returns ST WERBURGH'S SCHOOL SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1103019
Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Overdue by 123 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 June 2021 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 23 March 2021 296 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 22 September 2019 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 19 September 2018 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required