WHITLEY BAY U3A

Charity number: 1095331
Charity reporting is overdue by 275 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 275 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 275 days
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 25 February 2020 362 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 27 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required