WHITLEY BAY U3A

Charity number: 1095331
Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2015 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019
Total gross income £5.94k £5.06k £7.04k £7.00k £7.00k
Total expenditure £6.61k £5.83k £5.55k £7.00k £7.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A