AMADEUS CHAMBER ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1098000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LOUISE BRECKNELL Chair 03 September 2011 None on record
JANE CUTLER Trustee None on record
Frances Flinter Trustee 06 January 2020
PROGRESS EDUCATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
HANNAH GRACE EDITH LIGHT Trustee 10 September 2011 None on record
JULIA KEEY DUSCHENES Trustee 15 September 2013 None on record
Alison Matthews Trustee 08 January 2018 None on record
YVONNE BUTTOLPH Trustee None on record
JENNY WIGRAM Trustee None on record