Trustees SHEKINAH MISSION (PLYMOUTH) LIMITED

Charity number: 1097409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR R MORGAN Chair 08 May 2003
None on record
Rev Andrew Farmer Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Dr Thomas James Comyn Scott-Gatty Trustee 10 March 2022
None on record
Rev Kenneth Charles BROMAGE Trustee 10 May 2018
Greenhook Fishing
Received: On time
Christine Little Trustee 09 November 2017
HAMOAZE HOUSE
Received: On time
STEPHEN CANHAM Trustee 09 November 2017
FOOD FOR THE HUNGRY UK
Received: On time
MARION RUTH LUCKHURST Trustee 17 March 2011
ROTARY CLUB OF YELVERTON TRUST FUND
Received: On time
ANTHONY JOHN ARTHUR THOMAS Trustee 27 May 2010
None on record
Dr JAMES ROBERT BUTLER Trustee 27 April 2006
None on record