Financial history CITIZENS ADVICE BRADFORD & AIREDALE AND BRADFORD LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1096130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.10m £2.22m £2.48m £2.43m £2.33m
Total expenditure £2.11m £2.17m £2.33m £2.22m £2.10m
Income from government contracts £2.09m £1.53m £1.49m £2.09m £2.11m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £909 £307 £238 £1.12k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.09m £2.22m £2.48m £2.42m £2.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £10.73k £1.23k £0 £558 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.11m £2.17m £2.33m £2.22m £2.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.40k £9.37k £0 £5.78k £6.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0