Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE BRADFORD & AIREDALE AND BRADFORD LAW CENTRE
Charity number: 1096130

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Charles Northage | Chair | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Coghill | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robinson | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Atif Waqar Bostan | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Beattie | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Walker Lister | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHAKIL AZAM | Trustee | 28 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAM ESSLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.