Trustees THE ROYAL MARSDEN CANCER CHARITY

Charity number: 1095197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir DOUGLAS JARDINE FLINT CBE Chair 01 December 2022
None on record
Nicole Junkermann Trustee 14 December 2023
Royal Academy Trust
Received: On time
ROGER GRAY Trustee 15 December 2022
COUNTESS OF MUNSTER MUSICAL TRUST
Received: On time
Andrew Fisher OBE Trustee 15 December 2022
None on record
Varun Chandra Trustee 15 June 2021
MARYLEBONE CRICKET CLUB FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Anya Hindmarch CBE Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Baroness Olivia Caroline Bloomfield Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Professor Nicholas van As Trustee 11 June 2019
None on record
Sir Terry Leahy Trustee 09 May 2018
None on record
Dame CAROLINE PALMER Trustee 16 November 2011
None on record