REFUGEE AID TRUST

Charity number: 1098991
Charity reporting is overdue by 506 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 140 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2021 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 506 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required