Financial history BRITISH SAFETY COUNCIL

Charity number: 1097271
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £9.35m £9.64m £10.04m £7.27m £8.16m
Total expenditure £9.81m £11.02m £10.79m £8.12m £6.33m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £88.29k £84.39k £158.68k £108.69k £139.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £8.85m £9.18m £9.47m £6.45m £7.77m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £407.81k £379.95k £416.81k £261.90k £255.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £447.63k £3.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.76m £10.96m £10.79m £8.07m £6.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £50.14k £57.15k £0 £46.83k £46.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £303.83k £233.06k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £50.14k £57.15k £0 £46.83k £46.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0