JERRY CLAY ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1095494
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.90k £10.49k £11.88k £12.48k £4.43k
Total expenditure £2.43k £10.80k £7.15k £14.26k £4.37k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A